This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:08 (UTC).

CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP VS. TULA KAREOTES

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TULA KAREOTES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

TULA KAREOTES

CHRIS MARIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF LIDDLE & LIDDLE, APC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED ON 03/30/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED ON 03/30/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 09/21/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 09/21/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751337.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751337.

COMPLAINT FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/30/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/30/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/25/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/25/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/25/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11944069 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11768255.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11944069 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11768255.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 09/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11944069 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11768255.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 03/30/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED ON 03/30/2016) RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4523477 RECEIVED ON 03/25/2016 01:00:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 03/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1311967 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2016 05:16:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751337.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CANAL STREET PARTNERS A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446597 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 10:35:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.