This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:57 (UTC).

CAMERON LABRIOLA VS. AARON BELDA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 CAMERON LABRIOLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AARON BELDA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMERON LABRIOLA

Defendant

AARON BELDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID L. ROARK

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/27/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/27/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 07/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 07/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928237 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752455.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928237 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752455.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 10/19/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 10/19/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/28/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/28/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/30/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/30/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/02/2016 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COMPLAINT FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4779493 RECEIVED ON 10/19/2017 04:39:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 07/21/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL CONTINUED TO 10/20/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 07/21/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C3.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/27/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/30/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 12/02/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/02/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/30/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928237 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752455.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LABRIOLA, CAMERON ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446824 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:54:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.