This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 11:20:52 (UTC).

CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC VS. SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 CALLAHAN BLAINE, APLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Callahan & Blaine, APLC

Defendants

Macoochehr Mike Amidnamin

Marzieh Soheila Amidnamin

South Bay Contractors, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen E Blaine

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41399222 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41399222 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/21/2022 02:09:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/21/2022 02:09:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 10/13/2022

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 10/13/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31121998 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31121998 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/22/2022 11:03:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/22/2022 11:03:00 AM.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 05/23/2022

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 05/23/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/20/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/20/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/20/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/20/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/20/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/20/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/20/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 04/20/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31145641 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31145641 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 03/04/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 03/04/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 03/04/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 03/04/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 03/04/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 03/04/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011153 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839102.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13011153 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12839102.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/18/2022

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/18/2022

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/18/2022

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/18/2022

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • HearingDescription: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE; Judge: OMNI; Department: C66

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41399222 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 10/21/2022 02:09:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/04/2023 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C66.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketTHE CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE OMNIBUS CALENDAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41397719 RECEIVED ON 10/13/2022 08:17:51 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 10/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31121998 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/22/2022 11:03:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/12/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13004451 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12832385.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CALLAHAN & BLAINE, APLC ON 02/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31116677 RECEIVED ON 02/04/2022 03:58:50 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less