This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 04:55:58 (UTC).

CALL & JENSEN VS. RAJNISH ARORA

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 CALL JENSEN filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against RAJNISH ARORA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Claimant and Petitioner

CALL & JENSEN

Respondents

JUST FUNKY, LLC

RAJNISH ARORA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Claimant and Petitioner Attorney

CALL & JENSEN

Respondent Attorney

Adli Law Group P.C.

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 08/20/2020

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 08/20/2020

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 09/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 09/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/31/2020

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/31/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/31/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/31/2020

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/20/2020

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/20/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/01/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/01/2020

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

NOTICE OF ORDER AND ORDER CONTINUING EXAMINATION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ORDER AND ORDER CONTINUING EXAMINATION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/19/2020 10:42:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 03/19/2020 10:42:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2890674 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2890674 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41061696 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41061696 REJECTED.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 01/30/2020

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 01/30/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12701197 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12526275.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12701197 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12526275.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/25/2018

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/25/2018

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/25/2018

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/25/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3691461 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3691461 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1522952 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1522952 REJECTED.

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2932907 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2020 09:01:56 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 09/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 08/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1756400 RECEIVED ON 07/31/2020 04:56:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3921099 RECEIVED ON 07/20/2020 12:05:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1748975 RECEIVED ON 07/01/2020 03:36:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT (AMENDED) FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (AMENDED (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE)) FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 01/31/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2636195 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2018 03:50:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketMOTION - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 02/09/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C14 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 12/21/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12272145 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12095874.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD FILED BY CALL & JENSEN ON 12/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3619264 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2017 09:19:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Just Funky, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALL & JENSEN is a litigant