This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 05:59:45 (UTC).

CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION VS. ALL FASHIONS CLOTHING, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2018 CALL JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALL FASHIONS CLOTHING, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORAT

Defendant

ALL FASHIONS CLOTHING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Other Attorneys

CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORAT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED ON 09/14/18) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2018.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED ON 09/14/18) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2018.

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4884139 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4884139 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 08/16/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 08/16/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 08/15/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 08/15/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3696876 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3696876 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/2018 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/2018 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 04/05/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 04/05/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 03/26/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 03/26/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12321817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12145589.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12321817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12145589.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4886866 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2018 04:08:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED ON 09/14/18) RECEIVED ON 09/13/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1540472 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2018 04:32:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1540470 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2018 04:30:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3696876 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/2018 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2657588 RECEIVED ON 04/05/2018 11:35:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 03/26/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12321817 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12145589.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CALL & JENSEN, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION ON 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4829063 RECEIVED ON 03/26/2018 05:01:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALL & JENSEN is a litigant