Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 08:22:25 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC. VS. CALIFORNIA AVERLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CALIFORNIA AVERLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.

CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC

Defendant

CALIFORNIA AVERLAND CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINES HAMPTON, LLP

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 08/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 08/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4988500 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4988500 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12579961 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12403969.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12579961 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12403969.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4982464 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4982464 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4981711 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4981711 REJECTED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 04/05/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 04/05/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 04/05/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 04/05/2019

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 05/16/19) RECEIVED ON 04/05/2019.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 05/16/19) RECEIVED ON 04/05/2019.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/02/2019 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 04/02/2019 01:30:00 PM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3776162 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3776162 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/02/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 10/25/2018

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 10/25/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 09/24/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 09/24/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4886815 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4886815 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 08/08/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 08/08/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12386352 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12210067.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12386352 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12210067.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 07/18/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 07/18/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 07/18/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 07/18/2018

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 08/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2815070 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4988500 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12579961 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12403969.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3807612 RECEIVED ON 06/28/2019 02:40:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4982464 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4981711 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3712127 RECEIVED ON 09/24/2018 11:29:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4886815 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 08/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3696610 RECEIVED ON 08/08/2018 01:03:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12386352 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12210067.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT, INC.; CALIFORNIA WATERS, LLC ON 07/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4866964 RECEIVED ON 07/18/2018 08:55:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AVERLAND CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA WATERS DEVELOPMENT INC is a litigant