This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 06:47:16 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS. ALBERT ARVAYO

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALBERT ARVAYO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cach, LLC

Defendant

Albert Arvayo

Irvine, CA 92618-3927

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Harris & Zide

Defendant Attorney

The Fullman Firm, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12921587 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12749428.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12921587 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12749428.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARVAYO, ALBERT ON 07/28/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARVAYO, ALBERT ON 07/28/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/29/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/29/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901459 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729243.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901459 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729243.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12921587 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12749428.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31044220 RECEIVED ON 07/28/2021 04:53:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ARVAYO, ALBERT ON 07/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31032699 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2021 08:25:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12901459 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12729243.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CACH, LLC ON 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21031336 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2021 09:16:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CACH LLC is a litigant