This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2023 at 03:42:15 (UTC).

C. S. VS. DOE 1

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 C S filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

C. S.

Defendant

Doe 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156746 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984843.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156746 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984843.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023.

DECLARATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023.

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY S., C. ON 02/23/2023

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY S., C. ON 02/23/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011470.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011470.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/03/2023 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/03/2023 01:30:00 PM.

ORDER - OTHER (SEALING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND CORROBORATIVE FACT, PERMITTING SERVICE ON DOE DEFENDANTS, PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED UNDER A FICTITIOUS NAME) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF O

ORDER - OTHER (SEALING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND CORROBORATIVE FACT, PERMITTING SERVICE ON DOE DEFENDANTS, PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED UNDER A FICTITIOUS NAME) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2023

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21276447 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21276447 REJECTED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21276447 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (SEALING CERTIFICATES OF MERIT AND CORROBORATIVE FACT, PERMITTING SERVICE ON DOE DEFENDANTS, PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED UNDER A FICTITIOUS NAME) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/03/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/03/2023 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 03/03/2023 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183343 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011470.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41452129 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023 04:50:39 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY S., C. ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY S., C. ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/20/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13156746 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12984843.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11081042 RECEIVED ON 12/23/2022 03:37:20 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 12/23/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY S., C. ON 12/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less