This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 03:02:38 (UTC).

BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 VS. CONSTANTINO DE TORE

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO 25 filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CONSTANTINO DE TORE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25

Defendant

CONSTANTINO DE TORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE DURINGER LAW GROUP PLC.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION - OTHER (SHERIFF RETAINING POSSESSION OF WRIT) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 02/08/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER (SHERIFF RETAINING POSSESSION OF WRIT) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 02/08/2018

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 12/13/2017

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 12/13/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/25/2017

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/25/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 08/25/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 08/25/2017 09:00:00 AM.

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE - BANK LEVY) FILED BY DE TORE, CONSTANTINO ON 08/10/2017

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE - BANK LEVY) FILED BY DE TORE, CONSTANTINO ON 08/10/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 08/09/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 08/09/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12199569 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12023309.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12199569 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12023309.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 08/07/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 08/07/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1407472 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1407472 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/28/2017

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 07/28/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 07/28/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 07/28/2017 09:00:00 AM.

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 07/21/2017

CLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 07/21/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12186908 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12010588.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12186908 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12010588.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 07/13/2017

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 07/13/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 07/13/2017

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 07/13/2017

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (SHERIFF RETAINING POSSESSION OF WRIT) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 12/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY 08/25/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION (SHERIFF'S PACKAGE - BANK LEVY) FILED BY DE TORE, CONSTANTINO ON 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION) FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4756092 RECEIVED ON 08/09/2017 12:22:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketCLAIM OF EXEMPTION - LEVY SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12199569 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12023309.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2454459 RECEIVED ON 04/12/2016 12:24:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2454415 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3397810 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11933108 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11757293.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BUSINESS PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP NO. 25 ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3388917 RECEIVED ON 03/08/2016 02:25:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Business Properties Partnership No. 31 is a litigant