This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:25:13 (UTC).

BURNAM-LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BURNAM-LIMITED CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Conservators

LISA D BURNAM

BRIAN P BURNAM

Conservatee

JOSEPH P BURNAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

BARTON KLUGMAN & OETTING

Conservatee Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LIMITED CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 05/08/2018 AT 01:45:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LIMITED CONSERVATOR 03/27/2018 01:45:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LIMITED CONSERVATOR CONTINUED TO 05/08/2018 AT 01:45 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • PROOF OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY BURNAM, BRIAN P.; BURNAM, LISA D. ON 03/27/2018; Filing Party: BURNAM, BRIAN P.; BURNAM, LISA D. ON 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • PROOF OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY BURNAM, BRIAN P.; BURNAM, LISA D. ON 03/27/2018; Filing Party: BURNAM, BRIAN P.; BURNAM, LISA D. ON 03/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3648814 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2018 04:22:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP - INVESTIGATION MEMO FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/21/2018; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1480750 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2018 10:26:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 03/21/2018; Filing Party: BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 03/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LIMITED CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 03/27/2018 AT 01:45:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 200 - APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233933 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057615.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1428961 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 11:10:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CITATION RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM FILED BY BURNAM, LISA D. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: BURNAM, LISA D. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM FILED BY BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY BURNAM, LISA D.; BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: BURNAM, LISA D.; BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR FILED BY BURNAM, LISA D.; BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: BURNAM, LISA D.; BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED BY BURNAM, LISA D.; BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: BURNAM, LISA D.; BURNAM, BRIAN P. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.