This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/18/2022 at 06:59:22 (UTC).

BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. VS. AUTOMOTIVE PERFORMANCE GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 BURCH CRACCHIOLO, P A filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against AUTOMOTIVE PERFORMANCE GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff

BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A.

Defendant and Debtor

AUTOMOTIVE PERFORMANCE GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiff Attorneys

DEWBERRY FIRM-THE

Law Offices of Gary A Bemis

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/20/2017

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/20/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/20/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/20/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/20/2017.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/20/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12064109.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12064109.

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A.; BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/31/2017

AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A.; BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/31/2017

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/3/18) RECEIVED ON 01/02/2018.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/3/18) RECEIVED ON 01/02/2018.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12276440 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12100180.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12276440 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12100180.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 07/12/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 07/12/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2690508 RECEIVED ON 07/12/2018 03:03:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 07/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12276440 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12100180.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3621706 RECEIVED ON 01/02/2018 01:15:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/3/18) RECEIVED ON 01/02/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A.; BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3603190 RECEIVED ON 10/31/2017 04:51:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240429 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12064109.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 10/20/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY BURCH & CRACCHIOLO, P.A. ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2604667 RECEIVED ON 10/20/2017 11:15:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURCH AND CRACCHIOLO P.A. is a litigant