This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:32 (UTC).

BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER VS. ESTATE OF ROSA MOISA

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ESTATE OF ROSA MOISA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER

Defendants

EDWARD MOISA

ESTATE OF ROSA MOISA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 10/16/2013 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • THE COURT ORDERS EDWARD MOISA BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2013
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER ON 10/16/2013; Filing Party: BUENA PARK NURSING CE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER ON 10/04/2013; Filing Party: BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER ON 10/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER ON 10/04/2013; Filing Party: BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER ON 10/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430246 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254118.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2013 AT 01:30:00 PM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: BUENA PARK NURSING CENTER ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less