This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 11:42:24 (UTC).

BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC VS. MARGARITA ARMAS AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 05/13/2016 BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARGARITA ARMAS AGUILAR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC

Defendants

MARGARITA ARMAS AGUILAR

EVELYN DELASANCHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDER AND MELLO, A.P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/30/2017

NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/30/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2017

NOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2017

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/29/2016

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/29/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 08/23/2016 03:22:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 08/23/2016 03:22:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 08/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 08/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 06/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 06/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DELASANCHA, EVELYN; AGUILAR, MARGARITA ARMAS ON 06/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DELASANCHA, EVELYN; AGUILAR, MARGARITA ARMAS ON 06/10/2016

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/24/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/24/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/24/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11970179 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11794335.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11970179 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11794335.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AGUILAR, MARGARITA ARMAS; DELASANCHA, EVELYN ON 05/19/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AGUILAR, MARGARITA ARMAS; DELASANCHA, EVELYN ON 05/19/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/19/2016

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/19/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11967309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11791454.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11967309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11791454.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (INTENT TO DISPOSE OF EXHIBITS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 08/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 08/23/2016 03:22:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 08/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 06/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • COURT TRIAL CONTINUED TO 08/15/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 08/15/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY AGUILAR, MARGARITA ARMAS; DELASANCHA, EVELYN ON 05/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 05/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DELASANCHA, EVELYN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 05/19/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DELASANCHA, EVELYN ON 05/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11967309 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11791454.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BSM MANAGEMENT, LLC ON 05/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3413719 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2016 01:07:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less