This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/13/2020 at 10:18:21 (UTC).

BRYANNA GUZMAN VS DAVID MACDONALD

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 BRYANNA GUZMAN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DAVID MACDONALD. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HENSON, CAROL L.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1164

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

HENSON, CAROL L.

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

MACDONALD, DAVID

GUZMAN, BRYANNA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/29/2020; Filing Party: MACDONALD, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 07/29/2020; Filing Party: GUZMAN, BRYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 07/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketHEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketDV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 07/24/2020; Filing Party: GUZMAN, BRYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; Department: L11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: GUZMAN, BRYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 07/01/2020; Filing Party: GUZMAN, BRYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 07/01/2020; Filing Party: GUZMAN, BRYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: GUZMAN, BRYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketHEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketEX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 07/01/2020; Filing Party: GUZMAN, BRYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less