This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/19/2019 at 02:25:52 (UTC).

BRYAN VS. PENDRAGON NORTH AMERICA AUTOMOTIVE INC

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 BRYAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PENDRAGON NORTH AMERICA AUTOMOTIVE INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMIE ANDREW BRYAN

Defendants

AUTOMOTIVE HORNBURG, INC.

PENDRAGON NORTH AMERICA AUTO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2016
  • PURSUANT TO CCP 1952 EXHIBITS HAVE BEEN DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • AMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY PENDRAGON NORTH AMERICA AUTOMOTIVE INC AKA JAGUAR LANDROVER NEWPORT BEACH ON 06/09/2016; Filing Party: PENDRAGON NORTH AMERI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • THE COURT TAKES THIS MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY BRYAN, JAMIE ANDREW ON 05/12/2016; Filing Party: BRYAN, JAMIE ANDREW ON 05/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • AMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF FILED BY BRYAN, JAMIE ANDREW ON 04/27/2016; Filing Party: BRYAN, JAMIE ANDREW ON 04/27/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY BRYAN, JAMIE A FOR 04 - SMALL CLAIMS >$1,500<=$5,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 50.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927264 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751489.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/09/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY BRYAN, JAMIE ANDREW ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: BRYAN, JAMIE ANDREW ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.