This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/07/2023 at 03:48:42 (UTC).

BRYAN GERARD GARCIA VS. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 BRYAN GERARD GARCIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Gerard Garcia

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Consumer Law Experts, PC

Defendant Attorney

Rosewaldorf LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183028 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011155.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183028 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011155.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/31/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/31/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 03/15/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 03/15/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 03/29/2023

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 03/29/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13206806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13034912.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13206806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13034912.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 04/18/2023

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 04/18/2023

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 04/20/2023

NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 04/20/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCONVILLE; Department: C28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 04/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11131146 RECEIVED ON 04/20/2023 03:45:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 04/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41476786 RECEIVED ON 04/18/2023 04:27:07 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13206806 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13034912.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11120812 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2023 10:27:24 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY FCA US LLC ON 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL - PETITION FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41460998 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2023 01:19:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/31/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C28 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13183028 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 13011155.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11104921 RECEIVED ON 02/22/2023 10:14:41 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCONVILLE, THOMAS ON 02/22/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, BRYAN GERARD ON 02/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less