This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 07:47:02 (UTC).

BRUGALETTA VS. MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 BRUGALETTA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Brugaletta

Defendant

Mercury Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lippsmith LLP

Defendant Attorney

Shaver, Korff & Castronovo LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION

NOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LIPPSMITH LLP FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12926593 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12754452.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LIPPSMITH LLP FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12926593 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12754452.

RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

RECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

REGISTER OF ACTIONS

REGISTER OF ACTIONS

CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS

CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER (08/02/2021)

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER (08/02/2021)

NOTICE - OTHER (OF COURT'S ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE [07/07/2021]) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

NOTICE - OTHER (OF COURT'S ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE [07/07/2021]) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (06/29/2021)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (06/29/2021)

MINUTE ORDER (06/29/2021)

MINUTE ORDER (06/29/2021)

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CHANGE VENUE [06/29/2021]) FILED BY MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/06/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CHANGE VENUE [06/29/2021]) FILED BY MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/06/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (06/10/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (06/10/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (05/26/2021)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (05/26/2021)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (05/24/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (05/24/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (05/21/2021)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (05/21/2021)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (05/21/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (05/21/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

COMPLAINT (5/21/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

COMPLAINT (5/21/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSFER RECLASSIFICATION AND/OR CONSOLIDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LIPPSMITH LLP FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12926593 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12754452.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR TRANSMITTED RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 08/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREGISTER OF ACTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER (08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER (OF COURT'S ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE [07/07/2021]) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING (06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER (06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CHANGE VENUE [06/29/2021]) FILED BY MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY ON 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (06/10/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (05/24/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT (05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET (05/21/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (5/21/2021) FILED BY BRUGALETTA, JOSEPH ON 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketLEGACY CASE INITIATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant