This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 03:41:34 (UTC).

BRUCE DUFAULT VS. MAPLEBEAR INC.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 BRUCE DUFAULT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MAPLEBEAR INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bruce Dufault

Defendant

Maplebear Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BB Law Group LLP

Defendant Attorney

Strongin | Burger, LLP

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13076154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12904156.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13076154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12904156.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 08/04/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 08/04/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13100031 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12928033.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13100031 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12928033.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MAPLEBEAR INC. ON 08/26/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MAPLEBEAR INC. ON 08/26/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41377396 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2022 12:24:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13100031 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12928033.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MAPLEBEAR INC. ON 08/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11021485 RECEIVED ON 08/04/2022 11:28:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 08/04/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21182369 RECEIVED ON 07/12/2022 04:42:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13076154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12904156.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/16/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DUFAULT, BRUCE ON 07/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 07/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAPLEBEAR INC is a litigant