This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:21:48 (UTC).

BRITTON WEERSING VS CHRIS WEERSING

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 BRITTON WEERSING filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHRIS WEERSING. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FLYNN, JOHN L., TRD. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1689

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

FLYNN, JOHN L., TRD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WEERSING, BRITTON

Respondent

WEERSING, CHRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • NOTICE - CHANGE OF ADDRESS 09/06/2018; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 09/06/2018; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 09/06/2018; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/06/2018 PRELIM & FINAL; Filing Party: WEERSING, CHRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/06/2018 PRELIM & FINAL; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 09/06/2018; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/06/2018; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/06/2018; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • MINUTE ORDER 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • HEARING - MOTION - COMPEL / COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - AT ISSUE 06/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - AT ISSUE 06/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 03/30/2016; Filing Party: WEERSING, CHRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/30/2016; Filing Party: WEERSING, CHRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/23/2016; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/17/2016; Filing Party: WEERSING, CHRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/17/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: WEERSING, CHRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: WEERSING, BRITTON

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.