This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/18/2019 at 15:46:02 (UTC).

BRIAN PACKER VS STEPHANIE PACKER

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BRIAN PACKER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STEPHANIE PACKER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MILLER, FRANZ E. and MINERICH, PAUL T.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8269

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judges

MILLER, FRANZ E.

MINERICH, PAUL T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

PACKER, BRIAN

Respondents and Not Classified By Court

PACKER, STEPHANIE

PACKER, BRIAN

Intervenor

COUNTY OF ORANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Attorney

DCSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/15/2019; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • HEARING - MOTION - MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/08/2019; Filing Party: PACKER, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • RESPONSE - GOVT NOTICE OF MOTION / OSC 05/08/2019; Filing Party: PACKER, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • MINUTE ORDER 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • HEARING - FEE WAIVER - COURT ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • MOTION - MODIFICATION 03/19/2019 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER HEARING 03/07/2019; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • MINUTES - DCSS ORDER 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • REQUEST - WAIVE ADDITIONAL COURT FEES 03/06/2019 FW002 SENT TO L71; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/24/2017; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • RESPONSE - CONSOLIDATED PETITION 05/24/2017; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • SUMMONS - PARENTAGE / CUSTODY & SUPPORT 05/24/2017; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 05/24/2017; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 05/24/2017; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DECLARATION 05/24/2017; Filing Party: PACKER, BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • ORDER - TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) - DENIED 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/24/2017; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION 05/24/2017 property control Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • EX PARTE REQUEST - FAMILY LAW 05/24/2017 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: PACKER, STEPHANIE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.