This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/17/2022 at 10:06:01 (UTC).

BRIAN CROSS VS LAURA CROSS

Case Summary

On 08/09/2016 BRIAN CROSS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LAURA CROSS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VU, NATHAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6859

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

VU, NATHAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CROSS, BRIAN A

Claimants

ST. JOSEPH HEALTH SYSTEM 401(K)/401(A) PLAN

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TAX DEFERRED 403(B) PLAN

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA TAX DEFERRED 457(B) PLAN

THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT SAVINGS PROGRAM

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT PLAN (UCRP) AND CAP

LOS ANGELES FIRE AND POLICE PENSIONS

CITY OF LOS ANGELES DEFERRED COMPENSATION PLAN

Respondent

CROSS, LAURA L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

POSEY & ASSOCIATES

Respondent Attorneys

SEASTROM SEASTROM & TUTTLE

LAW OFFICE OF DAVID T. RUEGG

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS 08/09/2016

SUMMONS 08/09/2016

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/09/2016 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/09/2016 Amount:$435.00

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/09/2016

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/09/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/09/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/01/2016

NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 09/01/2016

NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 09/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 09/01/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 09/01/2016

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 09/09/2016 Amount:$435.00

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 09/09/2016 Amount:$435.00

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 09/09/2016

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 09/09/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/09/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 09/27/2016

PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 01/26/2017

PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 01/26/2017

REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 01/26/2017

REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 01/26/2017

PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 01/26/2017

PLEADING JOINDER - EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN 01/26/2017

REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 01/26/2017

REQUEST - JOINDER EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN & ORDER 01/26/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/06/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/06/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/06/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 02/06/2017

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 01/31/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 08/08/2019 Re: The University of California Tax-Deferred 403(B) Plan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 08/08/2019 Re: Fire and Police Pension Plan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 08/08/2019 Re: City of Los Angeles Deferred Compensation Plan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 08/08/2019 Re: The University of California 457(b) Deferred Compensation Plan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 07/05/2019 Notice - Limited Scope Respresentation; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 04/29/2019 Withdrawal Of Attorney; Filing Party: CROSS, LAURA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 04/26/2019; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • HearingDescription: TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE; Department: L67

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketTRIAL - SHORT CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 09/09/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: CROSS, LAURA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 09/09/2016; Filing Party: CROSS, LAURA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/09/2016; Filing Party: CROSS, LAURA L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/01/2016; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 09/01/2016; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 09/01/2016; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 08/09/2016; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/09/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/09/2016; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/09/2016; Filing Party: CROSS, BRIAN A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less