This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 00:14:12 (UTC).

BRENDA PERLIN VS. TEICH ABAZARNIA DENTAL CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 BRENDA PERLIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TEICH ABAZARNIA DENTAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENDA PERLIN

Defendant

TEICH ABAZARNIA DENTAL CORPO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 11/05/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/05/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO H13 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH ON 11/05/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED FILED BY PERLIN, BRENDA ON 09/17/2013; Filing Party: PERLIN, BRENDA ON 09/17/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/05/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PERLIN, BRENDA REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/2013 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462206 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 09:06:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY PERLIN, BRENDA ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: PERLIN, BRENDA ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY PERLIN, BRENDA ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: PERLIN, BRENDA ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PERLIN, BRENDA ON 08/12/2013; Filing Party: PERLIN, BRENDA ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less