This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 08:32:25 (UTC).

BRANDON BEAR VS. WL HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 03/03/2017 BRANDON BEAR filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WL HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELISSA SALAS

TREVOR MYERS

ALBINA AZARIAN-MYERS

YUFENG ZHANG

AMBER HEYDINGER

KAREN CHRISTOPHER

BRIAN WORKMAN

DAVID JOE

BURCU KALAYCIOGLU

MICHELLE BOWMER

GANDHI LUONG

JAMES HEYDINGER

ALP KALAYCIOGLU

SHARON ITPICK

TEIKO INVESTMENTS, LLC

JULIE JORDAN

ALLISON QUILL

WILLIAM CHRISTOPHER

PATRICK QUILL

MASAYUKI YOSHIDA

112 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFER LAW GROUP

Other Attorneys

SKEBBA, ISAAC, BISHOP & BUECHLER

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M BUREK

LETOFSKY-MCCLAIN

MARTUCCI & ASSCOCIATES

KENNEDY & SOUZA APC

BOORNAZIAN, JENSEN & GARTHE

LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM & GAROFALO

MOKRI VANIS & JONES

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

SANTA CRUZ, BROWNWOOD & CANNON

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA LLP

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT

SKEBBA, ISAAC & BISHOP

SKEBBA, ISAAC, BISHOP & HENDERSON

LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM & CARLSON, APC

Wolfe & Wyman LLP

 

Court Documents

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/02/2019

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/02/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12557120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12381024.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12557120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12381024.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND VACATE TRIAL DATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/22/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND VACATE TRIAL DATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/22/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/17/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/17/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/17/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/17/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/07/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/07/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12490065 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12313764.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12490065 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12313764.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE & VACATE TRIAL DATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/28/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE & VACATE TRIAL DATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/28/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/22/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/22/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/22/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/22/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/07/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/07/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 12/18/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 12/18/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 12/12/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 12/12/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/13/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/13/2018

WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/09/2018

WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/09/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/08/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/08/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/08/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/08/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/09/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/09/2018

165 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1651049 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2019 09:01:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12557120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12381024.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND VACATE TRIAL DATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3792955 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2019 03:22:24 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN CX101 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2796055 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2019 03:22:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
257 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2017-03-23 11:21:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/02/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX101.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/02/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX101 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SANDERS, GLENDA ON 03/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12117366 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11941189.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEAR, BRANDON; BEAR, CAITLIN; BALBOA ROYALE, L.P.; BOWMER, MICHELLE; BRENDER, THERESE; CHRISTOPHER, WILLIAM; CHRISTOPHER, KAREN; DE GRAW, SCOTT; DE GRAW, CHRISTINE; GALASSO, JOHN;OTHERS ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEAR, BRANDON; BEAR, CAITLIN; BALBOA ROYALE, L.P.; BOWMER, MICHELLE; BRENDER, THERESE; CHRISTOPHER, WILLIAM; CHRISTOPHER, KAREN; DE GRAW, SCOTT; DE GRAW, CHRISTINE; GALASSO, JOHN;OTHERS ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BEAR, BRANDON; BEAR, CAITLIN; BALBOA ROYALE, L.P.; BOWMER, MICHELLE; BRENDER, THERESE; CHRISTOPHER, WILLIAM; CHRISTOPHER, KAREN; DE GRAW, SCOTT; DE GRAW, CHRISTINE; GALASSO, JOHN;OTHERS ON 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4687417 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2017 01:45:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less