This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/15/2022 at 03:45:26 (UTC).

BRANDED ONLINE, INC VS. FLIGHT PHASE 1 LLC

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 BRANDED ONLINE, INC filed an Other lawsuit against FLIGHT PHASE 1 LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Branded Online, Inc

Defendants

Flight Phase 1 LLC

Incipio LLC

Lincoln Property Company

Flight Phase I Owner, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin P Eramo

Defendant Attorney

CGS3, LLP

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY; FLIGHT PHASE I OWNER, LLC ON 07/08/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY; FLIGHT PHASE I OWNER, LLC ON 07/08/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13075808 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12903810.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13075808 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12903810.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY; FLIGHT PHASE I OWNER, LLC ON 07/08/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY; FLIGHT PHASE I OWNER, LLC ON 07/08/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1998153 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1998153 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/13/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/13/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/13/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/13/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/14/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/14/2022

MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/13/2022

MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/13/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13064167 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12892160.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13064167 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12892160.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FLIGHT PHASE 1 LLC; LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY ON 06/09/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FLIGHT PHASE 1 LLC; LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY ON 06/09/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FLIGHT PHASE 1 LLC; LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY ON 06/09/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY FLIGHT PHASE 1 LLC; LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY ON 06/09/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/08/2022.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/08/2022.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/08/2022

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/08/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/02/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/02/2022

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; Judge: STRICKROTH; Department: C15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41356613 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2022 03:15:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31178650 RECEIVED ON 07/08/2022 03:14:10 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13075808 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12903810.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY; FLIGHT PHASE I OWNER, LLC ON 07/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY; FLIGHT PHASE I OWNER, LLC ON 07/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1998153 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41346261 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2022 04:28:12 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13064167 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12892160.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/08/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41342150 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2022 02:52:49 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13057738 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12885754.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/21/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRANDED ONLINE, INC ON 06/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER STRICKROTH, MICHAEL ON 06/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Incipio, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRANDED ONLINE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY DBA TEXAS LINCOLN PROPERTY COMPANY is a litigant