This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:26:12 (UTC).

BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST VS. BASILIO ROSARIO

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BASILIO ROSARIO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST

ARILD BRAATHEN TRUSTEE, ON BEHALF OF THE BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST

ARILD BRAATHEN TRUSTEE, ON BEHALF OF T

Defendant

BASILIO ROSARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALDER AND MELLO, A.P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/30/2017

PROPOSED JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 11/21/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 11/21/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

WRIT (11/27/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

WRIT (11/27/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12258337 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12082057.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12258337 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12082057.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/30/2017

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/30/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSARIO, BASILIO ON 10/17/2017

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSARIO, BASILIO ON 10/17/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/17/2017

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/17/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/16/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/16/2017 08:30:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/30/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ANSWER) FILED BY ROSARIO, BASILIO ON 10/17/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (ANSWER) FILED BY ROSARIO, BASILIO ON 10/17/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 01/08/2018

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 01/08/2018

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ARILD BRAATHEN TRUSTEE, ON BEHALF OF THE BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 11/16/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ARILD BRAATHEN TRUSTEE, ON BEHALF OF THE BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 11/16/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057072.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057072.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12258337 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12082057.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (11/27/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY ARILD BRAATHEN TRUSTEE, ON BEHALF OF THE BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED 11/21/2017) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4788340 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017 02:08:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 11/16/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • POSSESSION OF THE FOLLOWING PROPERTY: 1226 W. BROOK ST. APT. E, SANTA ANA, CA 92703 IS AWARDED TO PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ROSARIO, BASILIO ON 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • ROSARIO, BASILIO REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 10/17/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ROSARIO, BASILIO ON 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233392 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057072.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BRAATHEN FAMILY TRUST ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3595442 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 02:00:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.