This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2018 at 09:24:48 (UTC).

BOVEE-CONSERVATORSHIP

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BOVEE-CONSERVATORSHIP was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Conservator and Guardian Ad Litem

CHERYL LIVINGSTON

Conservatee

CAROLINE BOVEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator and Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

MCGONIGLE & HUNSAKER, LLP

Conservatee Attorney

PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • LETTER OF CONSERVATORSHIP SUBMITTED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL REJECTED ON 04/06/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY CHERYL LIVINGSTON IS APPROVED.; Filing Party: CHERYL LIVINGSTON IS APPROVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY 04/03/2018 11:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3648603 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2018 12:16:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROBATE CONSERVATOR FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 03/29/2018; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 03/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2653615 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2018 02:05:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • SUPPLEMENT FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 03/23/2018; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • LETTERS RECEIVED 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • SURETY BOND FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 03/22/2018; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/13/2017; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR SCHEDULED FOR 03/13/2018 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 200 - APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057415.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1428808 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 05:41:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL CONSERVATOR SCREENING FORM FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION - CONSERVATORSHIP FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • CITATION RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROBATE CONSERVATOR FILED BY LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: LIVINGSTON, CHERYL ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.