This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2019 at 08:58:38 (UTC).

BOUCHAN V BOUCHAN

Case Summary

On 09/27/2012 BOUCHAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BOUCHAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9360

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

Respondent

BOUCHAN, JESUS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2013
  • JUDGMENT 04/23/2013 15:45:00 # Pages:7; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/23/2013 09:12:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/23/2013 15:31:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 04/23/2013 15:30:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/23/2013 15:30:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 04/23/2013 10:18:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY JUDICIAL OFFICER 04/23/2013 12:04:00 GRANTED # Pages:2; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 04/23/2013 08:57:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 04/23/2013 10:18:00 5C SENT TO DUTY L67 # Pages:2; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/23/2013 16:13:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 04/23/2013 16:13:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/23/2013 16:10:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 04/23/2013 16:10:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 04/23/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 02/13/2013 08:47:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/27/2012 13:52:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • SUMMONS 09/27/2012 13:50:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 09/27/2012 13:50:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: BOUCHAN, MARGARITA

    Read MoreRead Less