This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/26/2019 at 11:30:28 (UTC).

BLOCH V BLOCH

Case Summary

On 11/18/2013 BLOCH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BLOCH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0487

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Bloch

Petitioner

BLOCH, JENNIFER

Defendant

Wolfgang Bloch

Respondent

BLOCH, WOLFGANG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, WOLFGANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/01/2016; Filing Party: BLOCH, WOLFGANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 06/01/2016 Judge:HURWITZ, LON F.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2014
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 10/29/2014 16:41:00 GENERATED BY 300 DAY STATUS CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 06/26/2014 09:05:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2014
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 03/27/2014 16:11:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/26/2013 14:31:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/18/2013 16:05:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 11/18/2013 16:05:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • SUMMONS 11/18/2013 16:05:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 11/18/2013 16:02:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: BLOCH, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less