This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 04:39:18 (UTC).

BLANCA CASTILLO VS. HOUSE OF IMPORTS LLC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 BLANCA CASTILLO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOUSE OF IMPORTS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blanca Castillo

Defendants

House of Imports LLC

Hudson Insurance Company

Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Consumer Action Law Group, PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/11/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/11/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/11/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163734 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991831.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163734 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991831.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/17/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HESSELTINE; Department: C23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11092392 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2023 10:09:58 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41438582 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2023 10:09:57 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31260113 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2023 10:09:56 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21259581 RECEIVED ON 01/16/2023 12:30:49 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/16/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13163734 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12991831.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21257740 RECEIVED ON 01/11/2023 12:40:12 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HESSELTINE, DAVID ON 01/11/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CASTILLO, BLANCA ON 01/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less