This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:18:29 (UTC).

BINH THI VU VS. STARLINE NAILS & SPA, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 BINH THI VU filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STARLINE NAILS SPA, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BINH THI VU

Defendant

STARLINE NAILS & SPA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIMARCO ARAUJO & MONTEVIDEO

Defendant Attorney

GATES, O'DOHERTY, GONTER & GUY, LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY STARLINE NAILS & SPA, INC. ON 09/27/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY STARLINE NAILS & SPA, INC. ON 09/27/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/12/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/31/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/31/2014 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 01/17/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 01/17/2014

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 08/12/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11527277 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11351084.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11527277 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11351084.

COMPLAINT FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11469999 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11293911.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11469999 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11293911.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430828 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254700.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430828 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254700.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/31/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/31/2014 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 01/17/2014

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 01/17/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STARLINE NAILS & SPA, INC. ON 01/15/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY STARLINE NAILS & SPA, INC. ON 01/15/2014

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 01/31/2014

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 01/31/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 10/02/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 10/02/2014

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY STARLINE NAILS & SPA, INC. ON 01/15/2014

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY STARLINE NAILS & SPA, INC. ON 01/15/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11529026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11352844.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11529026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11352844.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/26/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/26/2013

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 10/02/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3197457 RECEIVED ON 10/02/2014 02:08:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/29/2014 01:34:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 10/03/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C16 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 05/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4196779 RECEIVED ON 05/29/2014 12:20:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/31/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 353087 RECEIVED ON 08/26/2013 10:58:05 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DI CESARE, JAMES ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430828 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254700.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY VU, BINH THI ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270549 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 10:04:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less