This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 06:44:04 (UTC).

BIJAN RIAZATI VS. AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 BIJAN RIAZATI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMAZON COM SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIJAN RIAZATI

Defendants

AMAZON.COM INC.

AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER DATED 03/29/2022 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 03/30/2022 03:13:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 03/29/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketAMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 03/29/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 03/29/2022 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C4 PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 08 - REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING IF DEFENDANT SERVED IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13019666 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12847613.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21133045 RECEIVED ON 03/11/2022 10:54:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC ON 03/11/2022; Filing Party: AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC ON 03/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY RIAZATI, BIJAN ON 03/07/2022; Filing Party: RIAZATI, BIJAN ON 03/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAMENDED CLAIM - PLAINTIFF FILED BY RIAZATI, BIJAN ON 02/03/2022; Filing Party: RIAZATI, BIJAN ON 02/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketRIAZATI, BIJAN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 01/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/14/2022; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/21/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY RIAZATI, BIJAN ON 01/14/2022; Filing Party: RIAZATI, BIJAN ON 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY RIAZATI, BIJAN ON 01/14/2022; Filing Party: RIAZATI, BIJAN ON 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant