This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2018 at 09:28:48 (UTC).

BERNAUDY-HOOKS -GUARDIANSHIP

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 BERNAUDY-HOOKS -GUARDIANSHIP was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litem

ZINA I EGBE

Minor

TREVOR L BERNAUDY-HOOKS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2017
  • CASE CLOSED BY OPERATION OF LAW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 11/07/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 11/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP RECEIVED ON 10/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 10/25/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 10/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • LETTER OF GUARDIANSHIP SUBMITTED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE REJECTED ON 10/25/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • AMENDED PETITION FILED BY ZINA IKEORE EGBE IS APPROVED.; Filing Party: ZINA IKEORE EGBE IS APPROVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • ZINA IKEORE EGBE APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN OF PERSON ONLY OF TREVOR LEE BERNAUDY-HOOKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • AMENDED PETITION HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN 10/17/2016 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF MINOR RECEIVED ON 10/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • EGBE, ZINA IKEORE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • EX PARTE SCHEDULED FOR 03/02/2016 AT 01:35:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • (P) PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2016 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C07 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DUTIES OF GUARDIAN FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY GUARDIAN OR CONSERVATOR FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL GUARDIAN SCREENING FORM FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR(S) FILED BY EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: EGBE, ZINA IKEORE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.