This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:19:14 (UTC).

BERNARDO GARCIA VS XI GAO-GARCIA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 BERNARDO GARCIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against XI GAO-GARCIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8278

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

Respondent

GAO-GARCIA, XI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 04/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 04/27/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • NOTICE - DEFAULT HEARING 03/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 02/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 01/19/2018 AMENDED; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 12/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 11/28/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/28/2017 PRELIM; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 11/28/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/28/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 11/28/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: GARCIA, BERNARDO ARTURO

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.