This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 15:54:12 (UTC).

BERENICE MONTES VS EDUARDO BRIBIESCA

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 BERENICE MONTES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EDUARDO BRIBIESCA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1882

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

Respondent

BRIBIESCA, EDUARDO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/08/2017

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/08/2017

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/08/2017

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/08/2017

SUMMONS 03/08/2017

SUMMONS 03/08/2017

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/08/2017 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/08/2017 Amount:$435.00

NOTICE - OTHER 03/13/2017

NOTICE - OTHER 03/13/2017

ORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED 03/08/2017

ORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED 03/08/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/24/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 03/24/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 03/24/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 03/24/2017

PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 03/24/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/24/2017

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/24/2017

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/24/2017

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/24/2017

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 04/19/2017

REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 04/19/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/19/2017 Amended

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/19/2017 Amended

MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 04/26/2017

MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 04/26/2017

MINUTE ORDER 06/16/2017

MINUTE ORDER 06/16/2017

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/16/2017

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/16/2017

STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 06/16/2017

STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 06/16/2017

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/16/2017

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/16/2017

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2017
  • HearingDescription: HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED; Department: L71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DocketHEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/16/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 06/16/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/16/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 06/16/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 04/26/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 04/19/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 04/19/2017 Amended; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 03/24/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 03/24/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/24/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER 03/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DocketREQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/08/2017 5C SENT TO L53; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/08/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/08/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 03/08/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 03/08/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED 03/08/2017; Filing Party: MONTES, BERENICE PALMA

    Read MoreRead Less