This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/13/2021 at 20:03:25 (UTC).

BENNETT MELTZER VS. VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 BENNETT MELTZER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENNETT MELTZER

Defendants

RECEIVABLES PERFORMANCE MANA

VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: VCC5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/29/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARINGS FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/01/2021; Filing Party: THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY SANDOVAL, MELISSA FOR 08 - REQUEST TO POSTPONE HEARING IF DEFENDANT SERVED IN THE AMOUNT OF 10.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963907 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791830.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC ON 10/29/2021; Filing Party: VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC ON 10/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUBPOENA) SUBMITTED BY MELTZER, BENNETT REJECTED ON 10/22/2021.; Filing Party: SERVICE (SUBPOENA) SUBMITTED BY MELTZER, BENNETT REJECTED ON 10/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY MELTZER, BENNETT ON 10/08/2021; Filing Party: MELTZER, BENNETT ON 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK FILED BY MELTZER, BENNETT ON 10/08/2021; Filing Party: MELTZER, BENNETT ON 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/30/2021; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/30/2021; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY MELTZER, BENNETT C FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK, 07 - CERTIFIED MAIL - SERVICE BY CLERK IN THE AMOUNT OF 105.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12950824 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12778729.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/09/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY MELTZER, BENNETT ON 09/30/2021; Filing Party: MELTZER, BENNETT ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY MELTZER, BENNETT ON 09/30/2021; Filing Party: MELTZER, BENNETT ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL STATEMENT FILED BY MELTZER, BENNETT ON 09/30/2021; Filing Party: MELTZER, BENNETT ON 09/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant