This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 06:49:48 (UTC).

BENJAMIN K. TUCKER VS. MILLER & SONS CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 BENJAMIN K TUCKER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MILLER SONS CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benjamin K. Tucker

Maranda E. Tucker

Defendants

Miller & Sons Construction Group, Inc.

Old Republic Surety Company

Tyler Jonathan Cohen

Suretec Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bridgford, Gleason & Artinian

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12939670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12767569.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12939670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12767569.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/25/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/25/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31079123 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31079123 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31080908 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31080908 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21085192 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21085192 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31085929 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31085929 REJECTED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOWARD; Department: C18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31085929 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21085192 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31080908 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31079123 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1909875 RECEIVED ON 10/25/2021 01:52:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21076989 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2021 12:21:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31074228 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2021 12:21:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1905975 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2021 12:21:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C18 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12939670 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12767569.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31058644 RECEIVED ON 09/03/2021 12:41:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOWARD, THEODORE ON 09/03/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY TUCKER, BENJAMIN K.; TUCKER, MARANDA E. ON 09/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miller & Sons, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC SURETY COMPANY, INC. is a litigant