This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 03:43:30 (UTC).

BELIA GARCIA VS. HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 BELIA GARCIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Andres Pineda

Belia Garcia

Defendants

General Motors LLC

Hardin Irvine Automotive, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Knight Law Group, LLP

Defendant Attorney

Erskine Law Group PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834563.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834563.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/12/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/12/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PINEDA, ANDRES; GARCIA, BELIA ON 04/07/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PINEDA, ANDRES; GARCIA, BELIA ON 04/07/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PINEDA, ANDRES; GARCIA, BELIA ON 04/07/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PINEDA, ANDRES; GARCIA, BELIA ON 04/07/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13037275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12865296.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13037275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12865296.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC ON 04/19/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC ON 04/19/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13037180 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12865201.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13037180 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12865201.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41324216 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2022 03:21:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13037180 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12865201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1977988 RECEIVED ON 04/19/2022 03:24:13 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13037275 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12865296.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HARDIN IRVINE AUTOMOTIVE, INC. ON 04/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GENERAL MOTORS LLC ON 04/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41319675 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2022 04:09:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21144179 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2022 04:10:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PINEDA, ANDRES; GARCIA, BELIA ON 04/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PINEDA, ANDRES; GARCIA, BELIA ON 04/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1950205 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2022 04:29:03 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006611 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/12/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GARCIA, BELIA; PINEDA, ANDRES ON 02/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 02/09/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hardin Irvine Automotive, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant