This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 04:26:33 (UTC).

BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. VS. DORAN CONSTRUCTION LLC

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DORAN CONSTRUCTION LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beacon Sales Acquisition, Inc.

Defendants

Doran Construction LLC, a limited liability company

Christopher Doran, an individual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John D Guerrini

Rodolfo Gaba Jr

Ryan M Arakawa

Gaba Guerrini Law Corporation

Other Attorneys

RODOLFO GABA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12796315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12623340.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12796315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12623340.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/27/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/27/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 05/17/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 05/17/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21038371 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21038371 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1870089 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1870089 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

STATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

JUDGMENT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

JUDGMENT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 09/08/2021

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 09/08/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12940222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12768121.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12940222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12768121.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 214 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 40.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12940222 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12768121.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 09/08/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21061790 RECEIVED ON 09/07/2021 10:51:16 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT - OTHER FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 07/22/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21038371 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41194135 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2021 04:53:40 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 05/17/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3949618 RECEIVED ON 10/27/2020 03:22:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12796315 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12623340.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2949753 RECEIVED ON 10/16/2020 01:57:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BEACON SALES ACQUISITION, INC. ON 10/16/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less