This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:17:12 (UTC).

BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP VS. MARTHA HEREDIA

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARTHA HEREDIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP

Defendant

MARTHA HEREDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID S. SCHONFELD, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/29/2013

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/29/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 354093 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2013 09:13:23 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BEACHWOOD PARTNERSHIP, LP ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348257 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 01:21:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less