This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 03:26:15 (UTC).

BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, VS. EDGE TECHNOLOGIES

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 BAXTER, BAILEY, ASSOCIATES, INC , A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDGE TECHNOLOGIES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Baxter, Bailey, & Associates, Inc., A Corporation, An Assignee Of Maczuk Industries,

BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A

Defendants

Edge Technologies

Metallic Resources, Inc,

Frederick Goldman Inc.

K&C Manufacturing

Tungsten Heavy Powder, Inc.

Dynamic Machine Resources, Inc.

Ge Appliances

GE Products

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grant Law, A Professional Law Corporation

Other Attorneys

GRANT LAW, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORAT

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3794197 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3794197 REJECTED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/14/2019

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/14/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/20/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/20/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/16/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/16/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/16/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/16/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2794377 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2794377 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12540247 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12364083.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12540247 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12364083.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3794197 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2794370 RECEIVED ON 05/14/2019 11:17:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2796609 RECEIVED ON 05/20/2019 03:40:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3792420 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2019 02:47:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 05/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2795514 RECEIVED ON 05/16/2019 02:35:38 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2794377 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12540247 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12364083.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., A CORPORATION, AN ASSIGNEE OF MACZUK INDUSTRIES, ON 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2787208 RECEIVED ON 04/23/2019 02:19:26 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tungsten Heavy Powder Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GE APPLIANCES, A HAIER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BELA TRUCKING INC is a litigant