This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:19:52 (UTC).

BARBARA MARTIN VS FRANK KOCH

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 BARBARA MARTIN filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against FRANK KOCH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1675

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARTIN, BARBARA

Respondent

KOCH, FRANK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2016
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 08/03/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 08/03/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 08/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 07/27/2016 & Memorandum for setting for hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MARTIN, BARBARA

    Read MoreRead Less