This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 04:30:55 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA VS.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 BANK OF AMERICA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against . This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America

Defendant

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hunt & Henriques, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13048905 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12876921.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13048905 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12876921.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/01/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13130994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12959065.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13130994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12959065.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022.

ORDER - OTHER (ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 664.6) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/03/2022

ORDER - OTHER (ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 664.6) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/03/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF OTHER COURT DISMISSAL - CONDITIONAL OR GOOD FAITH.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ON SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 664.6) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41405443 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022 01:09:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13130994 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12959065.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21229829 RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022 01:09:58 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/01/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 11/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13048905 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12876921.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA ON 05/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41334588 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2022 12:37:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
Please note that some of the information in this case has been redacted.