This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/08/2017 at 08:14:42 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN, ET AL VS CHRYSILIOS

Case Summary

On 04/18/2011 BANK OF AMERICA, N A , SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against CHRYSILIOS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN

Defendants and Others

CHRYSILIOS CHRYSILIOU, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010

ADAM SMITH

JO ANNE ERICKSON

PHLT, LLC

KAREN ERICKSON

KENT DEE ERICKSON

PHTRE, L.P.

ANTHONY PRINCIPE, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010

KELLY SCOTT SMITH

CHRISTOPHER KENT ERICKSON

RDPH PROPERTIES, INC

Cross Defendants

KENT DALE ERICKSON

ADAM SMITH

JO ANNE ERICKSON

HERMINIGILDA SMITH

DAVID EUGENE SMITH

KAREN ERICKSON

ANGELA SMITH GRINSTEINER

SMITHSONI FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

KEITH ALLEN ERICKSON

KENT DEE ERICKSON

JENNA KRISTINE ERICKSON

JEFFREY TAYLOR ERICKSON

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN

KELLY SCOTT SMITH

CHRISTOPHER KENT ERICKSON

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

PALMIERI TYLER WIENER & WALDRON LLP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

SMITH LC

HICKMAN & CARRILLO

SONGSTAD & RANDALL LLP

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SONGSTAD & RANDALL LLP

SONGSTAD RANDALL COFFEE & HUMPHREY LLP

PALMIERI TYLER WIENER & WALDRON LLP

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY ANTHONY PRINCIPE, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; CHRYSILIOS CHRYSILIOU, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; RDPH PROPERTIES, INC; PHTRE, L.P.; THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN FAMILY STOCK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/10/2015

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY ANTHONY PRINCIPE, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; CHRYSILIOS CHRYSILIOU, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; RDPH PROPERTIES, INC; PHTRE, L.P.; THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN FAMILY STOCK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 02/10/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES: COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES FOR CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING MORE THAN 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11696825 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11521128.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 22 - COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES: COURT REPORTER PER DIEM FEES FOR CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING MORE THAN 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11696825 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11521128.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 11/06/2014

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 11/06/2014

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3199150 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3199150 REJECTED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 10/07/2014

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 10/07/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/02/2014 01:52:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/02/2014 01:52:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 04/10/2014

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 04/10/2014

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 03/21/2014

EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 03/21/2014

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 12/20/2013

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 12/20/2013

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/17/2013 02:04:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/17/2013 02:04:00 PM.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN; SMITHSONI FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/09/2013

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN; SMITHSONI FAMILY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 10/09/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF JOINDER TO OPPOSITION) FILED BY ERICKSON, KENT DALE; ERICKSON, KAREN; ERICKSON, JEFFREY TAYLOR; ERICKSON, JENNA KRISTINE; ERICKSON, CHRISTOPHER KENT ON 04/18/2013

NOTICE - OTHER (NOTICE OF JOINDER TO OPPOSITION) FILED BY ERICKSON, KENT DALE; ERICKSON, KAREN; ERICKSON, JEFFREY TAYLOR; ERICKSON, JENNA KRISTINE; ERICKSON, CHRISTOPHER KENT ON 04/18/2013

OPPOSITION FILED BY RDPH PROPERTIES, INC; PHTRE, L.P.; THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN FAMILY STOCK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/08/2013

OPPOSITION FILED BY RDPH PROPERTIES, INC; PHTRE, L.P.; THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN FAMILY STOCK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 03/08/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11312609 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11136501.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11312609 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11136501.

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CHRYSILIOS CHRYSILIOU, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; RDPH PROPERTIES, INC; PHTRE, L.P.; THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN FAMILY STOCK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 12/13/2012

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CHRYSILIOS CHRYSILIOU, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; RDPH PROPERTIES, INC; PHTRE, L.P.; THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN FAMILY STOCK LIMITED PARTNERSHIP ON 12/13/2012

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11189177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11013069.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11189177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11013069.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 04/25/2012

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 04/25/2012

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF JOHN S. CLIFFORD) FILED BY CHRYSILIOS CHRYSILIOU, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1998, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; ANTHONY PRINCIPE, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1998, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; RDPH PROPERTIES, INC; PHTRE, L.P. ON 09/29/2011

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF JOHN S. CLIFFORD) FILED BY CHRYSILIOS CHRYSILIOU, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1998, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; ANTHONY PRINCIPE, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1998, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; RDPH PROPERTIES, INC; PHTRE, L.P. ON 09/29/2011

358 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY CHRYSILIOS CHRYSILIOU, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010; ANTHONY PRINCIPE, CO-TRUSTEE OF THE PHILIP HOHNSTEIN TRUST DATED AUGUST 9, 1988, AS RESTATED ON MAY 28, 2010 ON 11/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1289895 RECEIVED ON 11/12/2015 03:25:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2013
  • AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4463456 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/16/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 09/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2406003 RECEIVED ON 09/09/2015 10:47:31 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
608 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 05/09/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 05/09/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 05/09/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 05/03/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 05/03/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 04/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 166 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 395.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 10881533 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 10705425.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARGINES, CHARLES ON 04/18/2011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 04/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE SMITHSONI FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED SEPTEMBER 4, 1996 AND EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF IRENE HOHNSTEIN ON 04/18/2011

    Read MoreRead Less