This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/25/2022 at 23:19:00 (UTC).

BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC VS. VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 BANC OF AMERICA LEASING CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC

Other and Defendant

Vivera Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Cross Defendants

Adam Panzer

Orange Credit Corporation

Ryan Duncan

Suiteimpact, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Serlin & Whiteford, LLP

Other and Defendant Attorney

Bryner Crosby, APC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12998822 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12826741.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12998822 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12826741.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF KEVIN P. WHITEFORD PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 SUPPORTINC DEMURRFR BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASINC AND CAPITAL, LLC TO CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/20/2022

DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF KEVIN P. WHITEFORD PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 SUPPORTINC DEMURRFR BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASINC AND CAPITAL, LLC TO CROSS COMPLAINT) FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/20/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/20/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/20/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/20/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/20/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/20/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 01/20/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12991905 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12819824.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONE LEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12991905 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12819824.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/05/2022

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/05/2022

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/30/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/30/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31101018 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31101018 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 10/13/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 10/13/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 09/17/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 09/17/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 08/18/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 08/18/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12998822 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12826741.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41289605 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2022 05:07:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ON 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1943297 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2022 05:07:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21112887 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2022 05:08:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1884093 RECEIVED ON 08/18/2021 04:02:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12925092 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12752949.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21049421 RECEIVED ON 08/04/2021 01:40:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 08/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC ON 08/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIVERA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. A CORPORATION DBA SENTAR PHARMACEUTICALS is a litigant

Latest cases where BANC OF AMERICA LEASING & CAPITAL, LLC is a litigant