This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/14/2022 at 14:47:12 (UTC).

BAJAMUNDI - SPOUSAL PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 BAJAMUNDI - SPOUSAL PROPERTY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSILYN BAJAMUNDI

Decedent

BENEDICT BAJAMUNDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALLAN A. VILLANUEVA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: (P) SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION; Department: C08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31118331 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2022 01:20:40 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/09/2022; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/09/2022; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41296069 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2022 08:15:23 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/09/2022; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21120572 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2022 10:18:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketAMENDED SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/08/2022; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/08/2022; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESS FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/08/2022; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41295331 RECEIVED ON 02/07/2022 04:18:44 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/07/2022; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41295027 RECEIVED ON 02/07/2022 11:07:11 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/07/2022; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 02/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(P) SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION SCHEDULED FOR 02/09/2022 AT 10:30:00 AM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 201 - FIRST PAPERS-OTHER PROBATE: PETITION COMMENCING OTHER PROCEEDINGS UNDER THE PROBATE CODE AND OBJECTIONS OR OTHER OPPOSITION TO SUCH PETITIONS, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDING IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12977669 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12805588.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41270535 RECEIVED ON 12/02/2021 09:57:33 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED BY BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 12/02/2021; Filing Party: BAJAMUNDI, ROSILYN ON 12/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VILLANUEVA, ALLAN A.