This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:15:11 (UTC).

BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. VS. DARRYL MEAD

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P C filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DARRYL MEAD. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P

BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C.

Defendant

DARRYL MEAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE GUERRINI LAW FIRM

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013.

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 08/12/2013

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 08/12/2013

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 07/03/2014

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 07/03/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11621097 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11445120.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11621097 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11445120.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 3/6/14) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2014.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 3/6/14) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11554800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11378705.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11554800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11378705.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 10/23/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 10/23/2014 09:00:00 AM.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 08/12/2013.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 08/12/2013.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430833 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254705.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430833 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254705.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR 10/23/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C65 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - JDX (JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM) IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11621097 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11445120.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 07/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4213159 RECEIVED ON 07/03/2014 08:55:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11554800 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11378705.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 3/6/14) RECEIVED ON 02/26/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3117952 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2014 11:41:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER UNASSIGNED ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430833 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254705.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY BABST, CALLAND, CLEMENTS AND ZOMNIR, P.C. ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462649 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 05:02:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less