This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 06:42:56 (UTC).

AZITA AKHTARI VS. WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 AZITA AKHTARI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Azita Akhtari

Defendant

Wireless Advocates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JML Law, APLC

Defendant Attorney

Littler Mendelson P.C.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12957529 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12785426.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12957529 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12785426.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/19/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/19/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC ON 12/07/2021

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC ON 12/07/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982966 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810887.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982966 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810887.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: SCOTT; Department: W02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12982966 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12810887.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31092162 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 01:18:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC ON 12/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21078748 RECEIVED ON 10/19/2021 03:09:30 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN W02 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12957529 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12785426.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31074427 RECEIVED ON 10/14/2021 03:56:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 10/14/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY AKHTARI, AZITA ON 10/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less