This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 07:54:23 (UTC).

AZADEH AFZALI VS. THE IRVINE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 AZADEH AFZALI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE IRVINE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Azadeh Afzali

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Cuesta Construction

Hardscape Solution, Inc.

Los Olivos Apartment Homes

The Irvine Company

Cuesta Properties, Inc.

Defendants and Others

Hardscape Solution, Inc.

Cuesta Properties, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arin Khodaverdian

Defendant and Other Attorneys

Veatch Carlson, LLP

Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin PC

Other and Cross Defendant Attorney

Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin PC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY AFZALI, AZADEH ON 06/07/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY AFZALI, AZADEH ON 06/07/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/08/2021 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/08/2021 08:30:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS-COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 11/08/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS-COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 11/08/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 11/08/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 11/08/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY AFZALI, AZADEH ON 11/04/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY AFZALI, AZADEH ON 11/04/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS-COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 11/03/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS-COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 11/03/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963717 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791640.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963717 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791640.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 10/28/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT IN THE AMOUN

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12962411 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12790334.

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 10/26/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 10/26/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES) FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 10/26/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES) FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 10/26/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES) FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 10/26/2021

MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (FORM INTERROGATORIES) FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 10/26/2021

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 10/26/2021

MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 10/26/2021

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/08/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21086599 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2021 11:55:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (CROSS-COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FILED BY CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 11/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21086636 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2021 12:37:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41260234 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2021 04:00:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY AFZALI, AZADEH ON 11/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HARDSCAPE SOLUTION, INC. ON 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/08/2021 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12897099 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12724898.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21027306 RECEIVED ON 06/07/2021 05:33:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 06/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY AFZALI, AZADEH ON 06/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY AFZALI, AZADEH ON 06/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY AFZALI, AZADEH ON 06/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant