This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:51:41 (UTC).

AYANA KONDO VS. MARGARET ANNE MARIE DOBYNS

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 AYANA KONDO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARGARET ANNE MARIE DOBYNS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RENNY SEIJI MACALLISTER

CONOR SEIJI MACALLISTER

AYANA KONDO

Defendant

MARGARET ANNE MARIE DOBYNS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDRES, ANDRES & MOORE, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

RAFFALOW, RHOADS & BRETOI

RAFFALOW, BRETOI & ADAMS

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1449767 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1449767 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (DEMAND FOR JURY FEES) FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI ON 08/24/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (DEMAND FOR JURY FEES) FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI ON 08/24/2016

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DOBYNS, MARGARET ANNE MARIE ON 07/05/2017

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY DOBYNS, MARGARET ANNE MARIE ON 07/05/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12019423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11843471.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12019423 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11843471.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4733324 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4733324 REJECTED.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/20/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/20/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 03/09/2017 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 03/09/2017 08:30:00 AM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/02/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/02/2017

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4796662 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4796662 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12128531 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11952344.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12128531 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11952344.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12165735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11989455.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 38 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ADJUDICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 500.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12165735 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11989455.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 02/21/2017 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 02/21/2017 02:00:00 PM.

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DOBYNS, MARGARET ANNE MARIE ON 07/05/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DOBYNS, MARGARET ANNE MARIE ON 07/05/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOBYNS, MARGARET ANNE MARIE ON 08/23/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DOBYNS, MARGARET ANNE MARIE ON 08/23/2016

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 03/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4824116 RECEIVED ON 03/12/2018 02:48:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 03/12/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/20/2018 AT 08:45 AM IN DEPARTMENT C11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 04/20/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI ON 03/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1475669 RECEIVED ON 03/06/2018 04:05:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/08/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • KONDO, AYANA APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM CR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONETOUCHLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928029 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752254.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KONDO, AYANA; MACALLISTER, RENNY SEIJI; MACALLISTER, CONOR SEIJI ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307026 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:05:56 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.