This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2018 at 09:29:29 (UTC).

AVITABILE - TRUST

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 AVITABILE - TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL J AVITABILE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SARAH A KIRLAND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2016
  • CASE STATUS UPDATED TO CASE CLOSED - ORDER GRANTED EFFECTIVE 12/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • TRUST PETITION HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 08/26/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • TRUST PETITION FILED BY MICHAEL AVITABILE IS APPROVED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED THIS DATE.; Filing Party: MICHAEL AVITABILE IS APPROVED PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH; AVITABILE, JOHN L. ON 08/26/2016; Filing Party: AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH; AVITABILE, JOHN L. ON 08/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4595511 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2016 04:24:29 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 08/23/2016; Filing Party: AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 08/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3448477 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2016 04:18:30 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4594239 RECEIVED ON 08/19/2016 07:43:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS FILED BY AVITABILE, JOHN L. ON 08/19/2016; Filing Party: AVITABILE, JOHN L. ON 08/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2016
  • SUPPLEMENT FILED BY AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 05/17/2016; Filing Party: AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 05/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1322059 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2016 11:59:21 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DECLARATION FILED BY AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 05/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • DECLARATION FILED BY AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 05/13/2016; Filing Party: AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 05/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4519329 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2016 09:47:47 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 03/18/2016; Filing Party: AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 03/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • (P) TRUST PETITION SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C06 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 199 - INTERNAL AFFAIRS IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928459 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752677.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385315 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:28:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • TRUST PETITION FILED BY AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: AVITABILE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less